judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOWDELL (FARUQ) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32084
Short Caption:DOWDELL (FARUQ) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135473Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/24/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/03/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Minutes of 3/19/98. Due Date: 10 days
04/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. District Court Minutes.
04/21/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits.
04/27/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Certified Copy of Order filed in District Court on 3/31/98.
07/24/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
07/24/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17346
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17452
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17452