judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEONARD LUIS BUSTOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0130)
Case Number:S-07-0130Case Docketed On:01/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LEONARD LUIS BUSTOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEONARD LUIS BUSTOS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeonard Luis BustosDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Brian J. Hunter
Bruce A. Salzburg
Holli Howell Austin-Belaski
Eric Alan Johnson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 37
Citation:180 P.3d 904

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/18/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/20/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/22/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Brian J. Hunter and Holli-Austin-Belaski, Student Interns for appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/19/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, confidential folder; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Holli Austin-Belaski, Student, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/15/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David L. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric Johnson, Director, PAP, and Holli Austin-Belaski, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Austin-Belaski for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirm in part and reverse in part. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/11/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Shantell Wyant signed for opinion on 4/9/08 for Warden of the Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/25/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/25/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card to Clerk of District Court and WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal