Case: 01-14-00623-CR
01-14-00623-CR
07/24/2014
Aggravated Robbery
Devonte Rashard Hayes
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/17/2015 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
05/12/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
05/12/2015 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
05/12/2015 | Motion to withdraw appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/11/2015 | Submitted | | |||||
03/25/2015 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
03/24/2015 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
03/19/2015 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||
03/19/2015 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/26/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Extension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions |
| ||||
02/20/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/20/2015 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/29/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/20/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/16/2015 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/08/2015 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/17/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/16/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
11/17/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time |
| ||||
11/17/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/17/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/13/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/13/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/13/2014 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/15/2014 | Record due | | |||||
09/11/2014 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/11/2014 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/11/2014 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
09/04/2014 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/04/2014 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/24/2014 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
07/24/2014 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
07/16/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/16/2014 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/17/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/17/2040 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Alan Keith Curry Devon Anderson |
Hayes, Devonte Rashard | Criminal - Appellant | Melissa Martin |
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 337th District Court
1356324
Mary Ann Rodriguez
20 Yrs TDCJ, $5000 Fine