Case: 15-0341
15-0341
05/06/2015
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
CHRIS DAVIS
MOTIVA ENTERPRISES, L.L.C.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/2015 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chris Davis. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/31/2015 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
06/19/2015 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
05/19/2015 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
05/14/2015 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf Montiva Enterprises, LLC. | ||||||
05/06/2015 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Chris Davis. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/31/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Davis, Chris | Petitioner | Mr. David E. Bernsen Ms. Jamie D. Matuska Mr. John Stephen Seale |
Fournet, Chris | Other interested party | Mr. Jon B. Burmeister |
Motiva Enterprises LLC | Respondent | Mr. Robert J. Hambright Mr. Jack Carroll Mr. Robert L. Florance IV Mr. Gilbert I. "Buddy" Low |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-14-00434-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 04-02-15
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable Steve McKeithen
Trial Court Information
1st District Court
Jasper
Honorable Craig M. Mixson
34022