judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Norma Jean Clark v. The State of Texas

Case: 01-13-00373-CR
01-13-00373-CR
05/01/2013
Murder
Norma Jean Clark
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
07/08/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
02/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
04/23/2021Record Sent
04/19/2021Letter received
06/05/2015Mandate issued
05/28/2015Case returned from higher court
04/29/2015Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsCCA refuses petition for discretionary review
03/26/2015Case forwarded to higher court
03/25/2015Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
03/25/2015Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/25/2015Petition for discretionary review due
03/16/2015Petition for discretionary review due
02/12/2015Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/2015Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/28/2015Motion for rehearing due
01/13/2015Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
01/13/2015Judgment Issued
11/18/2014Submitted
10/08/2014Letter issued by the court
09/05/2014Submitted action withddrawn
08/05/2014Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
07/09/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
07/08/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/08/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/08/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/08/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
07/08/2014Case ready to be set
06/27/2014State brief due
05/30/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
05/30/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/30/2014State brief due
04/30/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/30/2014State brief due
03/31/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/31/2014State brief due
02/27/2014Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/21/2014Appellants brief due
02/11/2014Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedExtension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions
12/27/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/20/2013Appellants brief due
11/26/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
11/20/2013Supplemental reporters record filed
11/14/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/14/2013Appellants brief due
10/15/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/14/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/14/2013Appellants brief due
10/04/2013Notice filed
09/13/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/13/2013Appellants brief due
08/26/2013Record due
08/14/2013Clerks record filed
07/18/2013Reporters record filed
07/18/2013Reporters record filed
05/28/2013Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
05/01/2013Case began in court of appeals
05/01/2013Notice of appeal received
04/26/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
04/26/2013Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/2015Case StoredCase stored
06/05/2015RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clark, Norma JeanCriminal - AppellantSarah V. Wood
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasAlan Keith Curry
Devon Anderson
Jessica Alane Caird
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable Marc C. Carter
1295757
Lisa Mills
25 Yrs TDCJ