judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTHA A. AKERS V. FATMATA S. KAMARA

Case Information: 10-DA-0012
Short Caption:MARTHA A. AKERS V. FATMATA S. KAMARAClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-7587-09Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMartha A. Akers NPro SeN
RespondentFatmata S. Kamara NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL (RECVD ONLY).
08/09/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
08/17/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION IS DENIED and petitioner is hereby directed to TENDER THE $10 FILING FEE W/N 10 DAYS from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this application. See DC App. R. 13. It is *****MORE*****
08/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 6. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA is HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
08/17/2010TMC - (LODGED) PFR - OTSC - motion to extend time to file (LODGED) response
09/07/2010FILING FEE
09/09/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to late file response to show cause order
09/09/2010RECEIVED - Petitioner's response to show cause order
09/28/2010 ORDERED that APPLICANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THE LODGED RESPONSE to this court's show cause IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged response. It is *****MORE*****
09/28/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
09/28/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 6...SEE HARDCOPY (KRNBST) (rl)
09/28/2010DISMISSED
10/01/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION requesting the Court to Reinstate this case
10/06/2010TMC - motion to reinstate
10/28/2010 On consideration of APPLICANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE the application, which is CONSTRUED as a MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, it is ORDERED that MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (KRNBST) (rl)