judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON v. CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation and CLINT COOK, Individually

Case Heading (S-07-0132)
Case Number:S-07-0132Case Docketed On:06/22/2007
Linked To: S-07-0133 , S-07-0162
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON v. CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation and CLINT COOK, Individually
Full Title:WAYNE GARRISON and PAMELA GARRISON, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. CC BUILDERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation and CLINT COOK, Individually, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWayne GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett
AppellantPamela GarrisonLawrence B. Hartnett
AppelleeCC BuildersKenneth S. Cohen
Heather Noble
AppelleeClint L. CookKenneth S. Cohen
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Fraud, Other, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2008 WY 34
Citation:179 P.3d 867

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/10/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/29/2007Motion - Other - Appellee's motion objecting to portions of appellants' opening brief.MotionOtherFinal
10/29/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/13/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2007Order - Other - Order sustaining objection and order requiring appellants to file a brief that includes adequate citations to the record.OrderOtherFinal
11/16/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted clerk of district court and informed that appellant will be required to file brief with record citations - hold the record until he has done that.EventPhone CallFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for CC Builders Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/04/2007Brief - Replacement brief of appellant pursuant to order - no certificate of service attachedBriefReplacementFinal
12/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eight volumes (two boxes total). Volumes I-V, original papers; Volume VI, exhibits; Volume VII, attachments to pleadings; Volume VIII, (one box containing) transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2007Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
12/10/2007Response/Objection - Other. Appellee's objection to appellants' opening brief (December 3 version)Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lawrence B. Hartnett for appellants Garrison and Kenneth S. Cohen for appellees CC Builders, Inc. and Clint Cook) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellants' reply to appellees' second objection to appellants' opening briefNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2008Petition - Rehearing, untimely. Called counsel and he directed copies be shreddedPetitionRehearingFinal
04/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Record signed for 4/17/08 by E. Johnson (2 cards, 2 boxes)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal