judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY VANEGDOM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-84)
Case Number:06-84Case Docketed On:04/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LARRY VANEGDOM v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LARRY VANEGDOM, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry Vanegdom Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2006Service - Mail returned docketing letter, "Return to Sender, No Longer Here"ServiceMail returnedFinal
05/02/2006Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/24/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2006Correspondence - Incoming; letter from Appellant re status of appealCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/14/2006Correspondence - Outgoing; letter to Appellant informing him case dismissed for want of prosecutionCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal