judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN GURLEY V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICS

Case Information: 10-AA-0973
Short Caption:CALVIN GURLEY V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Elections & Ethics (BEE)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:10-007Filed Date:08/09/2010

Opening Event Date:08/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/16/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCalvin Gurley N
Charles J. JanusNY
RespondentD.C. Board of Elections & EthicsN
Kenneth J. McGhieNN
Rudolph M.D. McGannNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/09/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
08/09/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
08/09/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Kenneth J. McGhie, Esq.
08/09/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
08/11/2010TMC - PFR - respondent's motion to dismiss (EXPEDITE)
08/11/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and the PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC Code 1-1001.08 (o)(2)(2001). (FITHNW) (jl)
08/11/2010DISMISSED
08/12/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - of the order of 8/11/10 granting respondent's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and requesting counsel fees
08/12/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION - to petitioner's motion for reconsideration
08/16/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration - oppo
08/18/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (FITHNW) (jl)
08/23/2010RECEIVED- copy of letter from petitioner asking court to reverse the decision and instruct the BEE place petitoner's name on ballot
08/27/2010TMC - petitioner's 2nd motion for reconsideration
09/07/2010 ORDERED that petitioner's MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (FITHNW) (jl)
09/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
10/20/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION LW
10/21/2010TMC - motion for clarifiation
10/27/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTINO FOR CLARIFICATION IS DENIED. (FITHNW) (jl)
04/17/2014FiledArchived