Case: 02-14-00116-CR
02-14-00116-CR
03/27/2014
Driving While Intoxicated
Atethan Voraritskul
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/2015 | Mandate issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
02/12/2015 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
02/11/2015 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/30/2014 | Case reinstated | | |||||||
12/30/2014 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||||
12/03/2014 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||||
10/30/2014 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
08/19/2014 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||||
08/13/2014 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||||
07/10/2014 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
07/07/2014 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
07/01/2014 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
06/09/2014 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/02/2014 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
03/27/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/09/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Catherine Luft |
Voraritskul, Atethan | Criminal - Appellant | Curtis Lilly |
Trial Court Information
16th District Court
Denton
Honorable Sherry Shipman
F-2013-0350-A
Court Reporter, 16th District Court
5 Years IDTDCJ