judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. O. C. PONDER, ET UX.

Case: A-379
A-379
11/23/1944
Application for Writ of Error
RUSSELL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
O. C. PONDER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/17/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/28/1945Letter Filed
01/17/1945Supplemental Brief filed
12/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/11/1944Response to Petition
11/23/1944Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/23/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Russell Construction CompanyPetitioner
O. C. Ponder, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information