judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRANG (FRED) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 36272
Short Caption:CRANG (FRED) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000074HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/30/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10000
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-13534
11/30/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-20944
11/30/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20728
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20852
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2002. 01-20852