judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARL WAYNE MASON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-80)
Case Number:06-80Case Docketed On:04/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CARL WAYNE MASON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CARL WAYNE MASON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarl Wayne MasonKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/31/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/01/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/02/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/03/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/03/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal