Case: 03-16-00274-CV
03-16-00274-CV
04/25/2016
Plea to jurisdiction
Taylor Housing Authority, A Municipal Housing Authority
Steve A. Shorts, Mallard Run Housing Development, and Taylor Sunset Housing Development
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/16/2016 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
08/24/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||
06/27/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
| ||
06/24/2016 | Brief received - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/06/2018 | Mandate issued | Affirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part |
| ||||||
04/26/2018 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part |
| ||||||
05/26/2017 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
12/09/2016 | Letter filed | | |||||||
10/12/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/19/2016 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument |
| |||||||
09/19/2016 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument |
| |||||||
09/16/2016 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
09/15/2016 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||||
09/14/2016 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
09/09/2016 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
09/09/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
09/09/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||||
08/24/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
08/16/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
08/16/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/05/2016 | Supplemental reporters record filed |
| |||||||
06/29/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/29/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
06/27/2016 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
06/24/2016 | Brief received - oral argument requested | | |||||||
06/16/2016 | Record Sent | | |||||||
06/08/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/07/2016 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
06/07/2016 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
05/25/2016 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
05/25/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
05/12/2016 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
05/12/2016 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
05/09/2016 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/27/2016 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/27/2016 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/25/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/06/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/06/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Taylor Housing Authority, A Municipal Housing Authority | Appellant | Mr. Ted W. Hejl Mr. R. Mark Dietz Mr. Mark J. Schroeder Mr. Douglas G. Cornwell |
Mallard Run Housing Development | Appellee | Mr. Steven B. Skarnulis Mr. Thomas J. Turner Mr. Zachary H. Bowman Mr. Patrick J. Fitzgerald |
Taylor Sunset Housing Development | Appellee | Mr. Patrick J. Fitzgerald Mr. Thomas J. Turner Mr. Zachary H. Bowman Mr. Steven B. Skarnulis |
Shorts, Steven A. | Appellee | Mr. Patrick J. Fitzgerald Mr. Steven B. Skarnulis Mr. Thomas J. Turner Mr. Zachary H. Bowman |
Trial Court Information
277th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Betsy F. Lambeth
15-0021-C277
Lynette Thorpe