judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORRIS VS. MORRIS

Case Information: 36270
Short Caption:MORRIS VS. MORRISCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV15233Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/20/2000 / Elliott-Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Patrick T. Nohrden--check no. 4785.
06/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09993
06/13/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
06/20/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: June 19, 2000. 00-10702
07/10/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11717
08/30/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 21, 2000. 00-15303
10/30/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 13, 2000. 00-19079
11/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20638
12/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-21345
12/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Notice of Change of Address for Respondent's Counsel. 00-22168
12/29/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-22716
01/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 01-00558
01/10/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.