judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM AUSTIN V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS

Case Information: 10-CV-0965
Short Caption:WILLIAM AUSTIN V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP3946-09Filed Date:07/29/2010

Opening Event Date:07/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/25/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Austin N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
Camilla C. MckinneyNN
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Todd S. KimNY
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 29, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
08/25/2010RECORD INDEX
08/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (certification of the record file 8/3/09)
08/25/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/05/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix no oppo to 11/9/10
10/12/2010 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before November 9, 2010. (JAC) elp
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 30, 2010 (unopposed)
11/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before November 30, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
11/24/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS & for an extension of time to file appellant's brief and appendix (unopposed) (elp) Granted
12/06/2010 On consideration of the motion of Bonniface K. Cobbina, Esquire, to withdraw his appearance as counsel of record for appellant and for an extension of time to file appellant's brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of Bonniface K. Cobbina, Esquire, is granted and his appearance is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 20 days from the date of this order as to the identity of new counsel, or whether appellant intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
12/23/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE - to order of 12/6/10 and for extension of time to file brief and appendix
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to identity his new counsel and to file the brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to identify his new counsel is granted and appellant shall identify his new counsel within 90 days from the date of the order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed with this court within 90 days from the date of this order. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
01/24/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED William Austin
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix to 4/21/11 NO OPPO
04/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix to 5/4/11
05/06/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief and appendix
05/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time and appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and joint appendix, it is ORDERED that the motions are granted and the lodged brief of appellant and the joint appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX - (JOINT)
05/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/09/2011FiledAPPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/13/2011FiledTMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to extend response time - (LODGED) oppo - REPLY
06/21/2011FiledAPLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to motion for summary affirmance until June 28, 2011 (unopposed)
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY- to oppo to motion for summary affirmance and oppo to motion for summary reversal
09/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave AND CLERK SHALL FILE OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY REVERSAL
09/09/2011FiledAppellant's Opposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance (Titled as: Appellant's Opposition to the Agency's Motion for Summary Affirmance and Motion for Summary Reversal)
09/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
09/09/2011FiledAffirmed
09/23/2011FiledMotion for extension of time to file petition for rehearing reheaing enbanc (Appellant) 60 days
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc on or before November 22, 2011.
11/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing en banc (Appellant)
11/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition for rehearing en banc on or before December 22, 2011.
12/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file petition for rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)
12/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to a petition for rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)
12/28/2011LodgedPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
01/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition for rehearing en banc.
01/06/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc
03/13/2012FiledMandate