judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-377
A-377
11/23/1944
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, CITY OF FORT WORTH
MATTIE V. LEE, JOESPH B. FLEMMING, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/25/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/14/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/12/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/09/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/20/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/20/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/01/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/28/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/25/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1945Brief on the Merits
02/12/1945Brief on the Merits
02/09/1945Brief on the Merits
02/02/1945Bond
01/30/1945Motion for Extension of Time filed
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
12/20/1944Response to Motion filed
12/20/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
12/20/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
12/06/1944Order from Lower Court filed
12/01/1944Response to Petition
11/28/1944Response to Petition
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/23/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/23/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Joesph B. Flemming, TrusteeRespondent
Mattie V. LeeRespondent
City of Fort WorthPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information