Case: 03-13-00098-CV
03-13-00098-CV
02/13/2013
Real Property
Highland Lake Villas Homeowners Association, Inc.
Kyle Rodenbeck
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/25/2013 | Mandate issued | Dismissed on Joint Motion |
| ||||||
05/10/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed on Joint Motion |
| ||||||
05/10/2013 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
05/09/2013 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/03/2013 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
04/24/2013 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
03/01/2013 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
02/25/2013 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
02/22/2013 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
02/22/2013 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
02/13/2013 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/25/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/25/2019 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodenbeck, Kyle | Appellee | Mr. Nicholas Pugh Mr. Frank Oliver |
Highland Lake Villas Homeowners Association, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. Michael B. Johnson Mr. Brian Douglas Hensley |
Trial Court Information
419th District Court
Travis
Honorable Stephen Yelenosky
D-1-GN-10-000439
Albert Alvarez