judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMERICAN NATIONAL VS. HELLER C/W 35905

Case Information: 36269
Short Caption:AMERICAN NATIONAL VS. HELLER C/W 35905Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35905 *, 36269Related Case(s): 35905
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A394017Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pearson, Patton, Shea, Foley & Kurtz--check no. 047791.
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09939
06/13/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
06/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-10854
06/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 6, 2000 at 9:00 a.m.. To Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 00-10856
06/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. (nos. 35905/36269). 00-10923
08/09/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: FedEx 8/8/00. Nos. 35905, 36269. Document No. 00-13860.
08/09/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. Nos. 35905, 36269. Document No. 00-13861.
08/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the unopposed motion to consolidate. Thus the opening brief and appendix filed in Docket Number 35905 will constitute the opening brief and appendix for these consolidated cases. These consolidated cases will proceed according to the briefing schedule based on the appeal in Docket Number 35905. In support of the request to remove respondent Comrie from the caption in these appeals, appellant informs this court that 'all claims with Vickie Comrie have settled.' We also grant that part of the unopposed motion. the clerk of this court shall remove respondent Comrie from the caption in these consolidated appeals. Nos. 35905, 36269. Document No. 00-14207.
09/07/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 9/6/00. Nos. 35905 & 36269. (00-15808)
10/05/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 10/02/00. Nos. 35905 36269. (00-17641)
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 35905/36269. (01-04782)
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 35905/36269.
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from a district court order granting summary judgment in a dispute over the availability of insurance coverage. fn1[All claims against Comrie have been settled, and she was removed from the case by order of this court dated August 15, 2000.] 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn22[American also argues that the intentional nature of Heller's action was admitted because Heller failed to respond to American's requests for admissions and, under NRCP 36(a), failure to answer constitutes an admission. In addition, American argues that Heller's guilty plea entered during his criminal trial was an admission that his acts were intentional. We conclude that these arguments are without merit.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 35905/36269. 01-09773
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10324
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-10324