judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANA SCOTT COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-63)
Case Number:06-63Case Docketed On:03/21/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DANA SCOTT COOPER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANA SCOTT COOPER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDana Scott Cooper Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 15
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/08/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/22/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance. William B. Pilger to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/24/2006Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel. Public Defender granted leave to withdraw.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/13/2006Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
06/16/2006Order - Denying motion to stay briefing schedule.OrderDenyFinal
06/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/30/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/10/2006Event - Phone Call. Called public defender regarding pending motion to withdraw filed by contract attorney. She will contact attorney considering taking the case and let this office know.EventPhone CallFinal
07/26/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/27/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/27/2006Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel. William B. Pilger allowed to withdraw.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
09/20/2006Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
09/20/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/03/2006Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
10/12/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/13/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/31/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from defendant requesting counsel and a copy of his file.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/30/2006Order - Denying appellant's requests.OrderDenyFinal
12/05/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter to Chief Justice requesting record and extension.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/05/2006Correspondence - Outgoing. Sent letter regarding the order on 11/30/06.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
12/11/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant. Treated as motion for extension of time.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/13/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/05/2007Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
01/25/2007Opinion - Published order. Order affirming judgment and sentence of the district court.OpinionPublished orderFinal
02/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/12/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/14/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Signed for 02/13/07 by Vicki Federer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/20/2007Service - Mail returned. Mandate and copy of return letter sent to Dana S. Cooper returned to sender - unable to forward.ServiceMail returnedFinal