Case: 01-11-00361-CR
01-11-00361-CR
04/21/2011
Murder
Selestino Torres
The State of Texas
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/03/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
11/14/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/2020 | Letter received | | |||||
10/28/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
10/28/2020 | Letter received |
| |||||
03/29/2018 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/28/2018 | Letter received | | |||||
12/15/2017 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/30/2017 | Letter received | | |||||
01/16/2014 | Case stored | | |||||
10/24/2012 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
09/24/2012 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
09/19/2012 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | CCA refuses petition for discretionary review | | ||||
08/23/2012 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
08/10/2012 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
07/06/2012 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||
05/04/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/13/2012 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/29/2012 | Opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
03/29/2012 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
03/06/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
02/14/2012 | State brief due | | |||||
02/13/2012 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
02/10/2012 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||
02/03/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
02/03/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/26/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
01/17/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
01/14/2012 | State brief due | | |||||
12/27/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
12/14/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/14/2011 | State brief due | | |||||
11/21/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
11/14/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
11/14/2011 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
09/26/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time | | ||||
09/14/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
09/14/2011 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
08/18/2011 | Reporters record due | | |||||
08/18/2011 | Record due | | |||||
08/15/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
08/10/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
07/15/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
05/19/2011 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
04/21/2011 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
04/21/2011 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
04/20/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
04/20/2011 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/24/2037 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Torres, Selestino | Criminal - Appellant | Jonathan Lewis Lewis Munier |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Patricia Rae R. Lykos Melissa H. Stryker |
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ruben Guerrero
1223088
Life