judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS J. RUFFIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0971
Short Caption:MARCUS J. RUFFIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 08-CO-0973 Consolidated: 08-CO-1263 , 10-CO-0971
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL5459-05Filed Date:07/30/2010

Opening Event Date:07/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/26/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus J. Ruffin Y
Marie L. ParkYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/02/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Marie Park, Esquire
08/20/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, that appeal no. 10-CO-971 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 08-CO-973 & 08-CO-1263 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Marie Park, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-971 nunc pro tunc to August 2, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-971 to this courth forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief, addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-971, shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (By: ETW)
09/02/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CO-971)
09/02/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CO-971)
09/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 3, 2010 (no oppo)
10/13/2010 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extensio of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-971 shall be filed on or before November 3, 2010. (Castillo)
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF 10C0971
11/03/2010APPENDIX 10CO971
12/01/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 10, 2011 (no oppo)
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 10, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/10/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/02/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/11/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (no oppo)
05/06/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief
05/26/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/26/2011ARGUED before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Schwelb Marie L. Park, Esq. for the APPELLANT Michael J. Friedman, Esq. for the APPELLEE
06/06/2011CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
07/07/2011AFFIRMED (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the rulings of the trial court on appellant's motions are affirmed.)
07/15/2011FiledMandate
07/20/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/21/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc