judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KANVICK (SCOTT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36274
Short Caption:KANVICK (SCOTT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000512Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10032
07/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-11635
07/13/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 3, 2000. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn (received and filed in this court on 6/9/00). Transferred Rough Draft Transcript from case no. 35839 to case no. 36274 per Phaedra. 00-12035
07/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12698
07/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.