judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ANNIE NORTON, TRUSTEE v. TOM GREEN COUNTY

Case: A-376
A-376
11/22/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ANNIE NORTON, TRUSTEE
TOM GREEN COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/26/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/06/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/04/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/24/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/22/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/14/1945Letter Filed
12/26/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1944Supplemental Brief filed
12/04/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/24/1944Response to Petition
11/22/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
11/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tom Green CountyRespondent
Annie Norton, TrusteePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information