judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. JONES, JR. V. PROFESSIONIAL TAX SERVICE, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-0972
Short Caption:CHARLES E. JONES, JR. V. PROFESSIONIAL TAX SERVICE, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB204-10Filed Date:08/04/2010

Opening Event Date:08/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Jones, Jr.YPro SeN
AppelleeProfessionial Tax Service Inc.N
Damon W. Wright NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
09/01/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to dismiss appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
09/01/2010DISMISSED
09/27/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived