judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLS (JUNIOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36275
Short Caption:MILLS (JUNIOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38690 , 42631 , 48373
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR000226Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/03/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10035
07/11/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on July 7, 2000 appointing John P. Calvert, Esq. as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-11930
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 24, 2000, appellant filed a proper person notice of appeal. On July 7, 2000, the district court appointed John P. Calvert, Esq., to represent appellant in his appeal. Appellant has submitted numerous proper person documents in this court. Appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, and we decline to do so. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. We deny all relief requested in appellant's proper person documents. 00-12813
07/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: John P. Calvert. 00-13040
07/27/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 7, 2000, April 11, 2000, April 17, 2000 through April 21, 2000 and June 8, 2000. To Court Reporter: I. Zihn. 00-13042
07/27/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13044
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 25, 2000, this court entered an order denying appellant permission to file documents in proper person and denying appellant the relief requestd in appellant's proper person documents. On July 25, 2000, after the above order was issued, this court received yet another proper person document. Appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person, and this court again declines to grant appellant permission to do so. We direct the clerk of this court not to receive any further proper person documents from appellant and to return to appellant unfiled the proper person document received on July 25, 2000, and all further proper person documents submitted in this appeal. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counel and shall address all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel. 00-13601
08/07/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Mills: returned unfiled the original Proper Person Document, pages 16-17-18-19 of Brief received 07/25/00 and the original Proper Person Arguments received 07/27/00.
08/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Mills: returned, unfiled the original Proper Person Document, Questions of Law received August 8, 2000 in this court.
08/15/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 7, 2000, April 11, 2000, April 17, 2000 through April 21, 2000 and June 8, 2000. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 00-14251
09/28/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter that was submitted to us on September 27, 2000.
10/03/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document.
11/07/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter addressed to Chief Justice.
11/07/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 8, 2000. 00-19572
11/13/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter addressed to the Chief Justice.
11/29/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated 11/25/00 addressed to Chief Justice Rose and Justice Young.
12/05/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated December 3, 2000 addressed to Chief Justice Rose .
12/11/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/07/00. 00-21608
12/11/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-21609
12/15/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter addressed to Chief Justice Rose dated December 13, 2000.
12/27/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letters dated 12/15/00 addressed to Chief Justice Rose.
12/28/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Document dated December 24, 2000.
01/09/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated January 2, 2001.
01/11/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 9, 2001. 01-00685
01/19/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Request to Invoke NRAP Rule C.
02/12/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/9/01. 01-02768
02/12/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix, Volumes 1 and 2. 01-02769
03/26/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
04/17/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Letter dated April 10, 2001 with attached documents.
05/01/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. District court documents.
05/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 01-07440
05/03/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11670
08/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 12, 2001, appellant Junior W. Mills submitted a proper person document. On August 7, 2000, we entered an order directing the clerk of this court not to receive any further proper person documents in this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the document submitted on July 12, 2001. Appellant shall address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel and shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. 01-13354
08/08/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Junior W. Mills. Returned unfiled, the original proper person Writ of Mandamus to invoke NRS 177.215, received July 12, 2001.
08/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11968
08/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2001. 01-11968