Case: 01-14-00321-CR
01-14-00321-CR
04/23/2014
Sexual Abuse of a Child
Ronald Wayne Schofield
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/15/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
06/20/2014 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
06/20/2014 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
06/05/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
06/05/2014 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
06/04/2014 | Submitted | | |||||
06/02/2014 | Record due | | |||||
05/21/2014 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/05/2014 | Document filed |
| |||||
04/24/2014 | Notification received that no record was taken | | |||||
04/24/2014 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
04/23/2014 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
04/23/2014 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
04/23/2014 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
04/01/2014 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/15/2014 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Schofield, Ronald Wayne | Criminal - Appellant | Ronald Wayne Schofield |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jerilynn Yenne David P. Bosserman |
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Judge 239th District Court
34910 (Count I & II)
Larry Hurst
2 Yrs TDCJ, Denied Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc