judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOUSTON (KEITH) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 36271
Short Caption:HOUSTON (KEITH) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33815 , 40652 , 42260 , 46587 , 50532 , 60820 , 65965 , 66642 , 67172 , 67172-COA , 71647 , 71647-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 82CR476401BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/18/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-09998
06/19/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-10454
06/28/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11064
10/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17998
10/16/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before November 10, 2000. 00-18313
11/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion. 00-19842
11/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to and including December 13, 2000, within which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 00-20086
12/13/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/13/00. 00-21834
12/13/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-21835
01/16/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/16/01. 01-00983
02/15/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 19, 2001. 01-03017
03/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 01-04874
03/22/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before April 18, 2001. 01-05059
04/18/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/18/01. 01-06650
04/18/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. To Appellant's Reply Brief. Placed in back of original and copies of brief. 01-06775
05/29/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to reply brief. 01-08928
06/06/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to reply brief. 01-09394
08/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13322
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13456
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 6, 2001. 01-13456