judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LILY M. HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0131)
Case Number:S-07-0131Case Docketed On:06/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:LILY M. HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LILY M. HARRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLily M. HarrisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2008 WY 23
Citation:177 P.3d 1166

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/07/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/22/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/01/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/30/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions and verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volumes IV-VI, exhibits; Volume VII, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/03/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court. Justice Hill files a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Kite joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/19/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/21/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal