judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: S. MICHAEL BENDER

Case Information: 10-BG-0943
Short Caption:IN RE: S. MICHAEL BENDERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN191-10Filed Date:08/02/2010

Opening Event Date:08/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
William R. RossNY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentS. Michael Bender NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/02/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending respondent.
08/04/2010RECEIVED a copy of a letter addressed to respondent from the Office of Bar Counsel advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation that respondent be suspended on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and of respondent's obligation to file a compliant affidavit pursuant to Sec 14 (g).
08/17/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending respondent from the practice of law for a period of three years and until further order of that court, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for three years with his reinstatement conditioned upon a showing of fitness. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the facts set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the Court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
09/29/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
10/04/2010TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
11/12/2010FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that S. Michael Bender, Esquire is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of three years with a fitness requirement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (RD, TE, KG)
11/29/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.