Case: 18-0582
18-0582
06/26/2018
Multidistrict Litigation
IN RE KURARAY AMERICA, INC. LITIGATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/14/2018 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | STRUCK (Filing Moot) - Plaintiffs Jose Casas, et al.'s Joinder in Response to Motion for Transfer filed by attorney Muhammad S. Aziz | | |||||||
07/20/2018 | Multidistrict Litigation Reply filed | Movant | Kuraray America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer filed by attorney Jeffrey S. Wolff | |||||||
07/13/2018 | MDL Response to Motion for Transfer | Intervenor | Intervenors' Response to Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of Alexander Camacho, et al. by attorney Kurt Arnold | |||||||
06/26/2018 | Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer | Movant | Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of Defendant Kuraray America, Inc. by attorney Jeffrey Wolff |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/2021 | Appointment of Pretrial Judge | The assignment of the Honorable Daryl Moore as the pretrial judge is terminated. The Honorable Lauren Reeder is assigned as the Pretrial Judge. The 234th District Court of Harris County is hereby designated as the Pretrial Court and all cases subject to the orders of August 29, 2018 and December 6, 2018 are transferred to the 234th District Court. (2/1/2021 3:05:07 PM) 18-0582 Kuraray - MDL Appointment Order 02-01-2021.pdf |
| |||||||
02/01/2021 | Motion before the MDL Panel disposed | Filing granted | Plaintiffs' Motion to Retransfer Case to New Pretrial Judge granted | | ||||||
01/22/2021 | Call received | Call received from counsel for movant. | | |||||||
01/21/2021 | Multidistrict Litigation Motion | Plaintiffs' Motion to Retransfer Case to New Pretrial Judge filed on behalf of Alex Varughese, et al. by attorney Ryan S. Pigg | ||||||||
10/18/2019 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||||
12/06/2018 | Appointment of Pretrial Judge | MDL Panel appoints Judge Daryl Moore of the 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas (12/6/2018 3:45:42 PM) 18-0582 MDL Order Issued 12-06-2018.pdf |
| |||||||
11/26/2018 | Letter Filed | Letter from appointed pretrial Judge Randy Wilson of the 157th District Court of Harris County advising the Panel that he will be unable to continue as pretrial judge after December 31, 2018. | | |||||||
08/29/2018 | Appointment of Pretrial Judge | Appointment of Pretrial Judge Randy Wilson of the 157th District Court of Harris County. (8/29/2018 4:00:42 PM) 18-0582 MDL Appointment Order 08-29-18.pdf |
| |||||||
08/28/2018 | Electronic communication received from Party | Electronic Communication from attorney Muhammad Aziz regarding Plaintiffs Jose Casas, et al's Joinder in Response to Motion for Transfer. Document was struck and Mr. Aziz states the filing is moot and will not be resubmitted. | ||||||||
08/23/2018 | Opinion issued by Multidistrict Litigation Panel | Issued | Per Curiam Opinion Issued (8/23/2018 10:42:58 AM) 18-0582 MDL ORDER ISSUED 08-23-18.pdf, 18-0582 MDL Opinion Issued 08-23-18.pdf |
| ||||||
08/23/2018 | Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Transfer disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Transfer granted | |||||||
08/14/2018 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | STRUCK (Filing Moot) - Plaintiffs Jose Casas, et al.'s Joinder in Response to Motion for Transfer filed by attorney Muhammad S. Aziz | | |||||||
07/20/2018 | Multidistrict Litigation Reply filed | Kuraray America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Transfer filed by attorney Jeffrey S. Wolff | ||||||||
07/13/2018 | MDL Response to Motion for Transfer | Intervenors' Response to Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of Alexander Camacho, et al. by attorney Kurt Arnold | ||||||||
06/26/2018 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Filing granted | Request for Stay granted | | ||||||
06/26/2018 | Motion to Stay filed before the MDL Panel | Request for Stay of all discovery incorporated within Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of Kuraray American, Inc. filed by attorney Jeffrey Wolff | ||||||||
06/26/2018 | Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer | Motion for Transfer filed on behalf of Defendant Kuraray America, Inc. by attorney Jeffrey Wolff |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/21/2021 | Status | Multidistrict Litigation Panel reviewing Motion filed | Motion to Retransfer case |
10/18/2019 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Personal Injury Plaintiffs | Respondent | Mr. Anthony G. Buzbee |
Kuraray America, Inc. | Movant | Mr. Jeffrey S. Wolff |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information