Case: PD-0220-17
PD-0220-17
05/05/2017
PDR Case Type
DOUGLAS, TERRY LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/22/2017 | RETURNED TO COA -- 69.4 T.R.A.P |
| |||||
07/26/2017 | PDR DISP | Refused |
| ||||
05/12/2017 | COA RECORD RECEIVED | | |||||
05/05/2017 | PDR FILED |
| |||||
03/03/2017 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) | Granted |
| ||||
03/03/2017 | MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B) | Filed | | ||||
03/03/2017 | EXT PDR DISP/NFE | Granted |
| ||||
03/03/2017 | EXT PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/22/2017 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | |
DOUGLAS, TERRY LYNN | Appellant | TERRY LYNN DOUGLAS |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-15-00445-CR
Affirmed
02-02-17
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
1396337R