Case: 04-08-00474-CR
04-08-00474-CR
07/03/2008
Indecency with a Child
Oscar Olivares Tovar
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/22/2008 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||
10/17/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
08/18/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
08/13/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
08/13/2008 | Submitted | | |||
08/13/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
08/01/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
07/29/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||
07/09/2008 | Order entered | | |||
07/03/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
06/30/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
06/30/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
05/28/2008 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/11/2033 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
10/17/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Tovar, Oscar | Criminal - Appellant | Angela J. Moore |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Susan D. Reed |
Trial Court Information
379th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Bert Richardson
2007-CR-4417
5 years & $1,200 fine