judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS J. SHERROD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0960
Short Caption:DENNIS J. SHERROD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6086-81Filed Date:07/30/2010

Opening Event Date:07/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis J. Sherrod YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on Juy 30, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/27/2010RECORD INDEX
08/27/2010RECORD COPIES
08/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
11/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 7, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (Castillo)
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to January 7, 2011.
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
12/29/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/29/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
02/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/04/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
02/07/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to supplment the record (-) - appellant's brief/appdx
04/25/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the documents attached to the motion as a supplemental record. It is ****MORE*****
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 - SUPERIOR COURT DOCUMENTS
04/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc v. Nat'l Deli Inc, 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
04/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
05/17/2011MANDATE ISSUED