judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JASON GAUSVIK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-244)
Case Number:06-244Case Docketed On:10/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JASON GAUSVIK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JASON GAUSVIK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason GausvikD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/25/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver - FAX waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal - originalNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
01/29/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/29/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal