judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENRY PRODUCTS VS. CROSSWHITE

Case Information: 36265
Short Caption:HENRY PRODUCTS VS. CROSSWHITECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352929Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/15/2000 / Mendoza, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Williams & Weise--check no. 2655.
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09883
06/15/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/27/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-13033
07/27/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-13034
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-14081
08/11/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
08/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal and Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. 00-15125
10/13/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On August 11, 2000, this appeal was dismissed pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties. On August 28, 2000, appellant filed a voluntary motion to dismiss this appeal. Appellant's motion is denied as moot. 00-18172