Case: 02-13-00050-CV
02-13-00050-CV
02/12/2013
Mandamus
In re Emil Lippe, Jr., Law Offices of Lippe & Associates, David Line, The Line Law Firm, Sun Tec Computer, Inc., Adisu S. Tadesse, Won Pak, and Ronny Luong
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/05/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |
04/05/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |
02/12/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/10/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
04/18/2013 | Case stored | | |||||
04/05/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |||||
04/05/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | | |||||
03/11/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
03/11/2013 | Letter received | | |||||
02/28/2013 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||
02/25/2013 | Response filed | | |||||
02/22/2013 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||
02/15/2013 | Response requested by the court | | |||||
02/12/2013 | Submitted | | |||||
02/12/2013 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/18/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Beshirs, Virginia | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Lippe, Jr. | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Tax Debt Acquisition Company, LLC | Real party in interest | Kelly J. Curnutt |
Tadesse, Adisu S. | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Ivex, LLC | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
The Line Law Firm | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Good, Celia | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Seis Guys Cellular, LLC | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Beshirs, Robert J. | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Luong, Ronny | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Liberty Tech Computers, Inc. | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Cosby, Donald J. | Respondent | Hon. Donald J. Cosby |
Pak, Won | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Good, David R. | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Southwell, Timothy E. | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Line, David | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Sun Tec Computer, Inc. | Relator | Emil Lippe |
OS Integration, LP | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Law Offices of Lippe & Associates | Relator | Emil Lippe |
Anew Business Solutions, Inc. | Real party in interest | Larry L. Fowler Jr. |
Trial Court Information
67th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Donald J. Cosby
067-204270-04