judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, BUS. & IND. VS. SAN JACINTO

Case Information: 36264
Short Caption:STATE, BUS. & IND. VS. SAN JACINTOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900819AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/23/2000 / Piscevich, MargoSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09877
06/23/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Margo Piscevich. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/03/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 8, 2001. 00-19340
07/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. A tentative settlement has been reached. Settlement Judge will advise within thirty days. 01-11629
09/12/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-15436
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-16029
10/23/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-17842
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-19407
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.