judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENT CRANGLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0959
Short Caption:KENT CRANGLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FUG11145-10Filed Date:07/29/2010

Opening Event Date:07/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKent Crangle Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed AS MOOT since he has already been extradited. (BY: ETW)
08/18/2010TMC - OTSC
10/07/2010 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. See Thorn v. Walker, 912 A.2d 1192, 1195 (DC 2006). (RDPRTE) (rl)
10/07/2010DISMISSED
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived