judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

M. L. PATTON v. AMERICAN HOME MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: A-384
A-384
11/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
M. L. PATTON
AMERICAN HOME MUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/20/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/24/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/19/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/09/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1945Letter Filed
02/23/1945Response to Motion filed
02/20/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/24/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/19/1945Brief in Support of Petition
01/05/1945Bond
12/30/1944Document received (See Remarks)
12/09/1944Response to Petition
12/08/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. L. PattonPetitioner
Harvey C. FordAmicus Curiae
American Home Mutual Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information