judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLINS (JEWEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32167
Short Caption:COLLINS (JEWEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR920506Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/27/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09831
04/23/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Transmit Notice of Entry of 2/5/98 Order. Due Date: 10 days.
05/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE NO. 32308 PER 8/14/98 ORDER.)
05/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE NO. 32308 PER 8/14/98 ORDER.)
07/16/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Transmit Notice of Entry of Order filed 2/5/98, if any. Due Date: 10 days. (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE NO. 32308 PER 8/14/98 ORDER.)
07/21/1998Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. from Washoe County District Deputy Court Clerk: This record does not have a "Notice of Entry of Order" filed December 5, 1998. Enclosed is a print out of the the case. (In repsonse to the Notice issued 7/16/98). (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE NO. 32308 PER 8/14/98 ORDER.)
07/31/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Appointment of Counsel.
08/14/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant filed two proper person notices of appeal from the district court order, the clerk of this court inadvertently opened two separate cases, docket nos. 32167 and 32308. We direct the clerk to administratively close docket no. 32308 and transfer to docket no. 32167 all documents filed or received in docket no. 32308. This appeal shall proceed under docket no. 32167. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Further, the record shall contain a copy of the transcript of the hearing conducted by the district court on January 29, 1998. (nos. 32167, 32308).
08/27/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4.
08/27/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/02/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Requesting this court to order the district court to transmit the record filed on January 5, 1998 (Received the original only).
01/04/2000Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Requesting this court to order the district court to transmit the record filed on January 29, 1998 (Received the original only).
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14263
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14470
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. 00-14470