judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAYTON (JOHN LEE) VS. STATE C/W 30799

Case Information: 32127
Short Caption:LAYTON (JOHN LEE) VS. STATE C/W 30799Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 30799 *, 32127Related Case(s): 30799
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - 262387Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/20/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09830
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32033, 32072, 32127, 32166, 32181, 32205.
05/20/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
05/20/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-RR/MS/NB Nos. 30799, 32127. 00-10263
07/25/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-RR/MS/NB Nos. 30799, 32127. 00-12808
07/26/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Supplement Petition for Rehearing. (Nos. 30799 and 32127).
08/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13885
08/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-13885
08/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 26, 2000, this court received a motion to supplement petition for rehearing. Cause appearing, appellant's motion is denied as moot.
12/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) nos. 30799/32127.