judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SABRINA HAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0954
Short Caption:SABRINA HAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-17738-09Filed Date:08/03/2010

Opening Event Date:08/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSabrina Hailey Y
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Richard Stolker, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Richard Stolker, Esquire
10/04/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 17, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
10/05/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statment re transcript
10/11/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/tape) 5/18/10 proc. a.m.
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (41 pgs/Armstrong) 5/18/10 proc.
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (42-84 pgs/Armstrong) 5/19/10 proc.
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (85-188 pgs/Armstrong) 5/20/10 proc. (INCOMPLETE)
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (48 pgs/Price) 5/21/10 proc.
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (7 pgs/Hunt) 5/24/10 proc.
11/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11 pgs/tape) 7/28/10 proc. w/cd
11/02/2010RECORD INDEX
11/02/2010RECORD COPIES
11/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (pretrial servs report-- filed 8/15/09) ***SEALED***
11/19/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed, it is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the document required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
11/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED)
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix until completion of transcripts
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's_ receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
01/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (183 pgs/tape) 5/20/10 proc. w/cd
01/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 4, 2011, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the trancsript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 13, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/4/11 no oppo
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 4, 2011. (JAC)
04/06/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
04/06/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
04/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/20/2011LIMITED APPENDIX
05/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/25/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate