Case: WR-76,582-01
WR-76,582-01
03/05/2012
11.07 HC
MARVIS, ZERICK AKA MARVES, ZERICK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/27/2012 | ACTION TAKEN | File and set | |
03/05/2012 | ADDITIONAL VOLUME TO REPORTER'S RECORD | | |
03/05/2012 | ADDITIONAL VOLUME TO REPORTER'S RECORD | | |
03/05/2012 | RR RECEIVED | | |
03/05/2012 | ADDITIONAL VOLUME TO WRIT RECORD | | |
03/05/2012 | ADDITIONAL VOLUME TO WRIT RECORD | | |
03/05/2012 | ADDITIONAL VOLUME TO WRIT RECORD | | |
03/05/2012 | WRIT RECEIVED | | |
11/21/2011 | MOTION DISP | DENIED | |
10/13/2011 | ADDRESS VERIFICATION-CLERK'S OFFICE | | |
10/12/2011 | MOTION RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/27/2012 | FILED | FILE & SET |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marvis, Zerick | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Randy Schaffer |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
736148-A