Case: 14-12-00283-CR
14-12-00283-CR
03/26/2012
Mandamus
In Re Antone Richie
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/26/2012 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/20/2015 | Letter filed |
| |||
02/21/2013 | Letter filed |
| |||
01/28/2013 | Case stored | | |||
12/17/2012 | Letter filed |
| |||
10/12/2012 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/10/2012 | Letter filed |
| |||
10/02/2012 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
09/28/2012 | Letter filed |
| |||
09/28/2012 | Case stored | | |||
09/14/2012 | Motion for rehearing disposed | DENIED |
| ||
05/10/2012 | Case stored | | |||
04/17/2012 | Motion for rehearing filed |
| |||
04/05/2012 | Memorandum opinion issued | DENIED |
| ||
04/04/2012 | Submitted | | |||
04/04/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/26/2012 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/28/2038 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
09/14/2012 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/28/2037 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Richie, Antone | Relator | Antone Richie |
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 230th District Court
1300545