judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENNINGS (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34797
Short Caption:JENNINGS (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971778Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08491
09/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certified copy of district court order appointing John Calvert as counsel for appellant. 99-08767
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeremy Bosler shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. fn1[On September 16, 1999, this court received a copy of an order from the district court appointing John Calvert to represent appellant in this appeal. The district court's order does not, however, relieve Jeremy Bosler of his obligations pursuant to NRAP 3C]. 99-09413
10/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of filing deadlines pending this court's ruling on the motion. 99-09765
10/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. The clerk of this court is directed to close administratively Docket No. 34797. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 34898 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 37497. This appeal shall proceed under Docket No. 34898. Nos. 34797, 34898. 99-10504
10/27/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.