judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WESLEY WILCOX v. TETON RANCH CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company,

Case Heading (06-94)
Case Number:06-94Case Docketed On:05/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WESLEY WILCOX v. TETON RANCH CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company,
Full Title:WESLEY WILCOX, Appellant (Defendant), v. TETON RANCH CONSTRUCTION, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWesley WilcoxKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeTeton Ranch Construction, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyJessica Rutzick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/08/2006Service - Mail returned, docketing letter sent to Ms. Rutzick - wrong address. Resent letter this dateServiceMail returnedFinal
05/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/31/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/31/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary (faxed copy)MotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
08/01/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/01/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/02/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary (original copy)MotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal