judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Ashley Danielle Siebert v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-18-01386-CR
05-18-01386-CR
11/14/2018
Driving While Intoxicated
Ashley Danielle Siebert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
01/03/2020Brief filed - oral argument requestedState
10/07/2019Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/03/2021Mandate issued
02/24/2021Case returned from higher court
01/27/2021Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/18/2020Petition for discretionary review filed
10/16/2020Petition for discretionary review received
10/06/2020Motion for rehearing received
09/16/2020Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/2020Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
02/26/2020Submitted
02/21/2020Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
01/07/2020Set for submission on oral argument
01/03/2020Brief filed - oral argument requested
01/03/2020State brief due
12/04/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/02/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/06/2019Case ready to be set
11/06/2019State brief due
10/11/2019Appearance of counsel
10/07/2019Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/07/2019Appellants brief due
09/09/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/2019Appellants brief due
08/08/2019Appellants brief due
08/06/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/09/2019Order enteredReinstate Appeal
07/09/2019Case reinstated
07/08/2019Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
06/21/2019Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
06/19/2019Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
06/12/2019Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
06/03/2019Response due
05/24/2019Letter issued by the court
05/18/2019Response due
04/18/2019Order issuedAbated
03/27/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/27/2019Appellants brief due
03/21/2019Motion to abate appeal filed
03/21/2019Motion to abate appeal filed
03/01/2019Reporters record due
02/25/2019Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
01/30/2019Reporters record due
01/24/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/2019Extension of time to file reporters record filed
12/31/2018Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/2018Record due
12/21/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed
11/28/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed
11/26/2018Docketing statement filed
11/14/2018Docketing statement due
11/14/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
11/13/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court
10/31/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/03/2021Case StoredCase stored
09/16/2045RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Siebert, Ashley DanielleCriminal - AppellantBenson Varghese
Anna Summersett
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn Creuzot
Ricardo Vela Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 6
Dallas
Honorable Angela King
MA1659378
Trisha Phillips
180 days in County Jail