Case: 13-14-00390-CV
13-14-00390-CV
07/08/2014
Mandamus
In Re State Farm Lloyds, Richard Freymann, and Ronald Castillo
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/2014 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/02/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
09/02/2014 | Petition for writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
09/02/2014 | Submitted | | |||||
08/29/2014 | Reply to response or motion filed | | |||||
08/27/2014 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/22/2014 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||
08/13/2014 | Record filed | | |||||
08/13/2014 | Response filed | | |||||
07/15/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
07/11/2014 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/11/2014 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed | | |||||
07/09/2014 | Order entered |
| |||||
07/09/2014 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/08/2014 | Fee paid | | |||||
07/08/2014 | Motion for temporary relief filed | | |||||
07/08/2014 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/02/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
09/02/2020 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Castillo, Ronald | Relator | Hon. Maxwell Micah Kessler |
Freymann, Richard | Relator | Hon. Maxwell Micah Kessler |
Reyna, Rose Guerra | Respondent | Rose Guerra Reyna |
Benavides, Jr. , Romeo | Real party in interest | Hon. Jennifer B. Hogan Hon. John S. Mostyn Hon. Richard P. Hogan Jr. Hon. Gilberto Hinojosa |
State Farm Lloyds | Relator | Hon. Maxwell Micah Kessler |
Benavides, Evelyn | Real party in interest | Hon. Jennifer B. Hogan Hon. Gilberto Hinojosa Hon. John S. Mostyn Hon. Richard P. Hogan Jr. |
Trial Court Information
139th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable J. R. 'Bobby' Flores
C-1821-14-C