Case: AP-76,823
AP-76,823
06/27/2012
Appeal Case Type
MARVIS, EX PARTE ZERICK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2013 | MANDATE ISSD | DENIED | | ||||
04/17/2013 | REHEAR DISP – HC | DENIED | | ||||
03/27/2013 | REHEAR FILED HC | | |||||
03/20/2013 | OPINION ISSD | Denied with opinion |
| ||||
09/12/2012 | SUBMITTED | | |||||
08/10/2012 | SUBMISSION FILE & SET NOTICE | | |||||
08/10/2012 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |||||
06/27/2012 | WRIT FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/29/2013 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marvis, Zerick | Applicant | Zerick Marvis Randy Schaffer |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-96-01562-CR
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA RAE LYKOS
736148-A